Dogfen lywodraethu RADLETT REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Rhif yr elusen: 1071255
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
LAWS ADOPTED 14/03/1972 AS AMENDED 08/12/1982, 23/07/1998, 31/05/2000, 26/02/2004, 27/09/2004, 22/03/2007 AND 15/05/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A SYNAGOGUE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC WORSHIP AND ADVANCING RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
HERTFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.