Dogfen lywodraethu MAHOGANY OPERA GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/02/1998 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 OCT 2022 as amended on 09 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, BUT PARTICULARLY THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MUSIC, SINGING, MIME, DANCE AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREOF PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.