NATIONAL GAMETE DONATION TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We work with potential recipients and donors, UK licensed fertility clinics, the media and support organisations to raise awareness of the need for gamete donors. We manage the voluntary contact register to enable people conceived through donated sperm or eggs, their donors and half-siblings before August 1991 to exchange information and, where desired, to contact each other.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Mae cyfanswm yr incwm yn cynnwys £100,000 o grant(iau) llywodraeth
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 21 Ebrill 1998: Cofrestrwyd
- 26 Ionawr 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- NGDT (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £93.85k | £74.56k | £142.25k | £161.57k | £154.27k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £66.20k | £93.08k | £133.23k | £158.96k | £190.93k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £160.13k | £100.00k |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 29 Ionawr 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 30 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR |
31 Mawrth 2016
(Mae'r cyfrifon |
30 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 28 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 28 Ionawr 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 30 Ionawr 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 30 Ionawr 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/05/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
'TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HUMAN FERTILITY, FERTILISATION AND EMBRYOLOGY, ASSISTED CONCEPTION, GENETICS AND THE NEED FOR EGG, SPERM AND EMBRYO DONORS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO DONORS AND POTENTIAL DONORS AND TO CONCERNED STAKEHOLDERS TO BENEFIT THE TREATMENT OF INFERTILITY BY PROMOTING THE RECRUITMENT OF GAMETE (EGG AND SPERM) AND EMBRYO DONORS AND MAINTAINING NATIONAL INITIATIVES TO ENABLE A REGULAR AND EVEN SUPPLY OF GAMETES AND/OR EMBRYOS TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF DONOR CONCEIVED OFFSPRING, THEIR FAMILIES AND DONORS BY THE PROVISION OF: A DONOR CONCEIVED REGISTER; SERVICES FOR MATCHING DONORS, OFFSPRING, AND SIBLINGS; AND THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE SUPPORT AND ADVICE FOR DONORS, OFFSPRING, SIBLINGS, AND THEIR FAMILIES'.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window