Dogfen lywodraethu FROME CANOE CLUB
Rhif yr elusen: 1104728

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/2012 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2019 as amended on 19 Feb 2020 as amended on 29 Apr 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MENDIP AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF KAYAKING AND CANOEING.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF MENDIP AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.