Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH SOCIETY OF CRIMINOLOGY
Rhif yr elusen: 1073154
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT CRIME CRIMINAL BEHAVIOUR AND THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.