Dogfen lywodraethu EARLY BREAK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 FEB 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 AUG 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO USE LEGAL AND ILLEGAL DRUGS BY THE PROVISION OF A COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND TREATMENT SERVICE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES. (B) TO ADVANCE RESEARCH INTO THE USE OF SUBSTANCES BY YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR YOUNG SUBSTANCE USERS AND MISUSERS AND THE PROFESSIONALS AND ORGANISATIONS WHO COME INTO CONTACT WITH SUCH PERSONS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE TRAINING, ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND RESOURCES. (D)TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION AND RAISING AWARENESS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.