Dogfen lywodraethu CRY IN THE DARK
Rhif yr elusen: 1071517

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/08/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN AND ADULTS WORLD-WIDE, PARTICULARLY IN ROMANIA AND EASTERN EUROPE, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACULTIES AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
WORLD-WIDE, PARTICULARLY IN ROMANIA AND EASTERN EUROPE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.