Dogfen lywodraethu THE INNS COURT COMMUNITY AND FAMILY CENTRE LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 JUN 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 APR 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 AUG 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF INNS COURT AND KNOWLE WEST . 2. TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
INNS COURT AND KNOWLE WEST
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.