Dogfen lywodraethu Citizens Advice Bournemouth, Christchurch and Poole

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 21 OCTOBER 1998, 16 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 20 MAY 2009. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 SEP 2017 as amended on 01 Aug 2019 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 11 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in Bournemouth, Christchurch & Poole and the surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
MAINLY IN, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN, THE AREA OF THE COUNCIL OF THE BOROUGH OF BOURNEMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.