Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH ORTHODONTIC SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEPTEMBER 2002, 8 OCTOBER 2006, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2009 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2010 as amended on 18 Sep 2011 as amended on 22 Sep 2012 as amended on 21 Sep 2013 as amended on 17 Sep 2014 as amended on 28 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF ORTHODONTICS, TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS IN ORTHODONTICS, AND TO ENCOURAGE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN ORTHODONTICS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.