SPORTS AID WEST MIDLANDS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Raising of funds and applying those funds as grants to assist British sportsmen and women
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2009
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Dinas Birmingham
- Swydd Amwythig
- Swydd Gaerwrangon
- Swydd Henffordd
- Swydd Stafford
- Swydd Warwig
Llywodraethu
- SPORTSAID WEST MIDLANDS (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/07/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £7.09k | £6.84k | £2.40k | £581 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £15.78k | £4.88k | £3.12k | £559 | £29 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2009 | 16 Chwefror 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2009 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 16 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 27 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 27 Tachwedd 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 04 Rhagfyr 2007 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 27 Tachwedd 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2006 | 27 Ionawr 2007 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD JUNE 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS AND WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT; (2) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FUNDS OR TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE (OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF) FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE SAME ARE PROVIDED) FOR PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (3) SUCH OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND BEING OBJECTS AND PURPOSES EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
WEST MIDLANDS REGION OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window