Elusennau cysylltiedig NEW COMMUNITY NETWORK
Rhif yr elusen: 1072645

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/11/1982
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/01/2000
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/10/2005
AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2009
AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05/03/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE NET PROCEEDS OF SALE MUST BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF REST, CONVALESCENCE, RECOVERY AND RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF AGE, YOUTH, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 21 Ionawr 2016 : Asset transfer out
- 25 Chwefror 2009 : Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Ionawr 2016 : Tynnwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.