Dogfen lywodraethu CANOLFAN CYNGHORI YNYS MON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND AGAIN ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2008. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 OCT 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 NOV 2016 as amended on 08 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF WALES AND ENGLAND.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.