Dogfen lywodraethu INTERNATIONAL PSYCHOANALYTICAL ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1071752

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 JAN 1998, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 31 JUL 1998, 20 JAN 2007, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 APRIL 2008 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE SCIENCE OF PSYCHOANALYSIS AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION RELATING THERETO.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.