TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY HOUSING LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Tower Hamlets Community Housing is a social landlord. THCH was formed in March 2000 with Government funding of 21million secured from Round 3 of the Estates Renewal Challenge Fund for the transfer of 1249 homes owned by the London Borough of Tower Hamlets. THCH has continued to grow through prudent local authority transfers and building new homes for social rent.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2017
Cyfanswm incwm:
£25,435,000
Roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £17.74m | |
Weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | |
Buddsoddiadau | £151.00k | |
Arall | £7.54m |
Cyfanswm gwariant:
£18,851,000
Codi arian | £0 | |
Weithgareddau elusennol | £18.85m | |
Arall | £0 |
£100 enillion (colledion) buddsoddiadau
Gwariant elusennol
Gwariant elusennol gydag enillion buddsoddi
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Codi arian a Arall Gwariant | £0 | |
Gwariant elusennol | £18.85m | |
Cadwyd i'w ddefnyddio yn y dyfodol | £6.58m |
Codi arian a Arall Gwariant | £0 | |
Gwariant elusennol | £18.85m | |
Cadwyd i'w ddefnyddio yn y dyfodol | £6.58m |
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Llety/tai
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Tower Hamlets
Llywodraethu
- 30 Tachwedd 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- 19 Ionawr 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI'I HESGUSODI)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £17.08m | £25.99m | £22.11m | £24.87m | £25.44m | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £14.19m | £16.86m | £17.52m | £20.71m | £18.85m | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £17.08m | £25.99m | £22.11m | £22.02m | £17.74m | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £0 | £0 | £0 | £232.00k | £151.00k | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.62m | £7.54m | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £14.19m | £16.86m | £17.52m | £20.71m | £18.85m | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £0 | £0 | £0 | £58.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Diffiniadau ar gyfer asedau a rhwymedigaethau
Asedau yw’r rhain, ac nid buddsoddiadau, a ddelir am fwy na 12 mis ac a ddefnyddir i redeg a gweinyddu’r elusen megis adeiladau, swyddfeydd, arddangosfeydd a gosodiadau a ffitiadau.
Buddsoddiadau Tymor HirBuddsoddiadau yw asedau a ddelir gan yr elusen gyda’r unig nod o gynhyrchu incwm a ddefnyddir ar gyfer eu dibenion elusennol megis cyfrifon cadw, rhanddaliadau, eiddo a rentir ac ymddiriedolaethau unedau.
Ailbrisir asedau buddsoddi bob blwyddyn ac fe’u cynhwysir yn y fantolen ar eu gwerth marchnad cyfredol.
Delir buddsoddiadau tymor hir am fwy na 12 mis.
Asedau yw’r rhain a ddelir yn gyffredinol am lai na 12 mis megis arian parod a balansau banc, dyledwyr, buddsoddiadau i'w gwerthu o fewn y flwyddyn sydd i ddod a stoc masnachu.
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwydArian dros ben neu ddiffyg yw hwn mewn unrhyw gynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffinnir sy’n cael ei weithredu ac mae’n cynrychioli ased neu rwymedigaeth tymor hir botensial.
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethauDyma’r holl symiau sy’n ddyledus gan yr elusen ar ddyddiad y daflen balans i drydydd partïon megis biliau sy’n ddyledus ond heb eu talu hyd yn hyn, gorddrafftiau banc a benthyciadau a morgeisi.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Asedau hunan ddefnydd | £85.60m | £85.55m | £87.63m | £162.74m | £165.84m | |
|
Buddsoddiadau tymor hir | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.00k | £11.00k | |
|
Cyfanswm asedau | £9.72m | £8.49m | £9.36m | £12.86m | £14.89m | |
|
Ased neu rwymedigaeth cynllun pensiwn budd a ddiffiniwyd | -£1.90m | -£1.82m | -£2.84m | -£2.91m | -£1.64m | |
|
Cyfanswm rhwymedigaethau | £78.08m | £70.31m | £69.44m | £72.12m | £72.32m |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 05 Rhagfyr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 05 Rhagfyr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 02 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 02 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2015 as amended on 03 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (11) PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (111) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALITY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM, AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (1V) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS. (V) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. (V1) SUPPORTING ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION CARRYING ON ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. "HOUSES" AND "HOSTELS" SHALL HAVE THE MEANINGS GIVEN BY SECTION 106 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985 AND SHALL INCLUDE BLOCKS OF FLATS WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 42 OF THE HOUSING ACT 1996.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window