Dogfen lywodraethu BELL VIEW (BELFORD)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/06/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF OLDER PEOPLE, DISABLED PEOPLE AND THOSE IN POOR HEALTH IN PARTICULAR THOSE RESIDENT IN RURAL NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND I. BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO THEIR CARERS; II. BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING INTERGENERATIONAL ACTIVITY; III. IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY IN RURAL NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND TO PROVIDE PEOPLE WITH A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE NEEDS AND WISHES OF PERSONS OF DIFFERENT AGE GROUPS. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, PARTICULARLY IN NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND
Maes buddion
NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.