OLDHAM KICKSTART PROJECT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To advance the education & training of young people in order to prepare them for working & adult life. The relief of unemployment for the public benefit in such ways as may be thought fit, including assistance to employment. The provision of recreational facilities for young people in the interests of social welfare. The prevention of crime and the rehabilitatition of young offenders.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2010
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Manceinion
- Oldham
- Rochdale
Llywodraethu
- 04 Mehefin 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- 14 Mehefin 2012: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- KICKSTART (Enw gwaith)
- KICKSTART OLDHAM KICKSTART TAMESIDE (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £533.88k | £451.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £540.27k | £643.18k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 13 Ionawr 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 21 Gorffennaf 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED ON 2 MAY 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ORDER TO PREPARE THEM FOR WORKING AND ADULT LIFE 2. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT 3. THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE 4. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY 5. THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE REHABILITATION OF YOUNG OFFENDERS
Maes buddion
GREATER MANCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window