Dogfen lywodraethu CARE FOR VETERANS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 SEP 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21 AUG 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 DEC 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE PERMANENT OR RESPITE ACCOMMODATION, END OF-LIFE CARE AND OUTPATIENT CARE FOR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BRITISH ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES, WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH CARE BY REASON OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY AND WHO REQUIRE NURSING CARE OR REHABILITATION.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.