Dogfen lywodraethu ACTION ON DISABILITY AND WORK UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/10/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE AND TO PROMOTE DISABLED PEOPLE'S EQUALITY IN THE UK, IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Maes buddion
BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.