3GS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We are the main delivery organisation for the Welsh Assembly's Communities First Programme in the electoral wards of Gurnos and Penydarren in the County Borough of Merthyr Tydfil. Some of our priorities include delivering regeneration programmes in the area and helping the community to become more involved with the local service providers i.e. local health board, local authority, schools etc.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Merthyr Tudful
Llywodraethu
- 23 Hydref 2003: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
3 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Davies | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lee James Davies | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RITA SMITH | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £162.27k | £131.00k | £21.35k | £14.77k | £8.81k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £182.85k | £510.00k | £29.24k | £35.32k | £13.38k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £16.00k | £13.50k | £1.80k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 31 Mawrth 2025 | 59 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 06 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 08 Hydref 2023 | 250 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 26 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 26 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 06 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 06 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | Download Agorwch mewn ffenestr newydd |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1999.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION IN THE NEW GURNOS, THE OLD GURNOS AND THE GALON UCHAF ESTATES IN THE MERTHYR TYDFIL COUNTY BOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS:- A - THE RELIEF OF POVERTY. B - THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; C - THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; D - THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR II) TO EXISTING BUSINESS. E - THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; F - THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING; G - THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; H - THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE HERITAGE OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND THE HERITAGE OF THE BENEFIT AREA AND OF BETTER WAYS OF CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; I - THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; J - THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE K - THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME L - SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
IN THE NEW AND OLD GURNOS AND THE GALON UCHAF ESTATES IN THE MERTHYR TYDFIL COUNTY BOROUGH, AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS.
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
3 G's Development Trust
15 Chestnut Way
MERTHYR TYDFIL
CF47 9SB
- Ffôn:
- 01685350888
- E-bost:
- reception@3gs.org.uk
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window