RELATE BERKSHIRE LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We help local adults and young people resolve difficulties in their personal relationships and build better relationships more able to withstand the pressure that lead to relationship breakdown, through counselling, sexual therapy and assessments. We also provide training to enhance family relationships through improved parenting skills.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Bracknell Forest
- Gorllewin Berkshire
- Reading
- Swydd Rydychen
- Wokingham
Llywodraethu
- 23 Rhagfyr 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
- 03 Mawrth 1999: Cofrestrwyd
- 23 Rhagfyr 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £232.14k | £240.25k | £232.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £248.32k | £240.38k | £239.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £13.70k | £30.28k | £6.50k | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 26 Awst 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 22 Mai 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 04 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 04 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS (2) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: (1) INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE; AND (2) WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS (3) TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: (1) MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL-BEING; OR (2) INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP (4) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT (5) TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (6) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
BERKSHIRE, WEST BERKSHIRE AND IMMEDIATELY ADJACENT AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window