Dogfen lywodraethu ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT MUSEUMS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 DEC 2020 as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND, THE CHANNEL ISLANDS AND THE ISLE OF MAN PROVIDED BY INDEPENDENT MUSEUMS, GALLERIES AND HERITAGE ORGANISATIONS. IN RESPECT OF THIS THE COMPANY DEFINES INDEPENDENCE AS TAKING RESPONSIBILITY FOR YOUR OWN DECISIONS, BEING ACCOUNTABLE FOR THEM, AND FOR NOT BEING SUBJECT TO ANOTHER’S AUTHORITY, NOR DEPENDENT ON ANOTHER FOR YOUR EXISTENCE.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM, REPUBLIC OF IRELAND, CHANNEL ISLANDS AND ISLE OF MAN
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.