Dogfen lywodraethu NORTH WEST ENGLISH SPRINGER SPANIEL RESCUE N.W.E.S.S.R.
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/01/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2011 as amended on 31 Mar 2019 as amended on 28 Mar 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To promote the welfare and relieve the suffering of the breed of dog known as the English Springer Spaniel who are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, neglect or such other circumstances as the trustees shall determine, in particular by the provision of facilities for the reception, care and rehoming of such animals.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.