Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY ACTION ROTHERHAM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF ROTHERHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL AND ITS ENVIRONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
LOCAL GOVERMENT AREA OF ROTHERHAM METROPOLITAN BOROUGH.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.