Dogfen lywodraethu CARERS TRUST LEA VALLEY CROSSROADS CARE SERVICE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 FEB 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 MAY 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASONS OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMPREHENSIVE SUPPORT SERVICES FOR CARERS THROUGHOUT GREATER LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS; AND (B) THE ASSISTANCE OF CARERS IN NEED INCLUDING BY RAISING AWARENESS OF ISSUES AFFECTING CARERS.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.