Dogfen lywodraethu LLANELLI AND MYNYDD MAWR RAILWAY COMPANY LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2012 as amended on 23 Oct 2021 as amended on 08 Dec 2024 as amended on 08 Dec 2024 as amended on 08 Dec 2024 as amended on 19 Apr 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To advance the education of the public in the role Cynheidre played in the industrialisation of South Wales and in particular the coal industry and the transportation of coal from pit to port. To promote for the benefit of the public the conservation protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment of the charity's woodland and grassland areas by promoting biological diversity.
Maes buddion
SECTIONS OF THE HISTORIC RAILWAY LINE BETWEEN LLANELLI AND TUMBLE WHICH COMPRISES THE FORMER LLANELLY AND MYNYDD MAWR RAILWAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.