Dogfen lywodraethu THE EAST LANCASHIRE HOSPICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09/01/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/01/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE: TO PROVIDE SPECIALIST, SUPPORTIVE AND END OF LIFE CARE FOR ADULTS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM A LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN EAST LANCASHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS OF BLACKBURN-WITH-DARWEN, HYNDBURN AND RIBBLE VALLEY, AND ANY SUCCESSOR AUTHORITIES; TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES OF ADULTS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM A LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS.
Maes buddion
EAST LANCASHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.