Dogfen lywodraethu NORTH WEST AIR AMBULANCE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 JULY 2000 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2017 as amended on 01 Oct 2019 as amended on 07 Oct 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND INJURY AND THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN LIFE BY THE PROVISION OR SUPPORT OF AN AIR AMBULANCE SERVICE IN LANCASHIRE, CUMBRIA, GREATER MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE, CHESHIRE AND SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; AND (2) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND INJURY AND THE PROTECTION OF HUMAN LIFE.
Maes buddion
LANCASHIRE, CUMBRIA, GREATER MANCHESTER, MERSEYSIDE AND CHESHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.