Dogfen lywodraethu SENSE INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 SEP 2017 as amended on 22 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE DEAFBLIND OR WHO HAVE A HEARING OR VISION IMPAIRMENT, INCLUDING THOSE WITH ADDITIONAL IMPAIRMENTS OR PERSONS WHO HAVE MULTIPLE DISABILITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING THE INTERESTS OF THE BENEFICIAL CLASS PROMOTING ACTION ON BEHALF OF THE BENEFICIAL CLASS IN ANY COUNTRY OF THE WORLD PROMOTING ACTIONS ON PREVENTION OF THE DISABILITIES OF THE BENEFICIAL CLASS AND TO UNDERTAKE OR PROMOTE RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.