Dogfen lywodraethu THE SHEENA AMOS YOUTH TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/12/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST.TO APPLY THEM IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"): (1) TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE PHYSICAL, SEXUAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH AMONGST YOUNG PERSONS IN THE ARE OF BENEFIT AGED UP TO 25YEARS AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR DISADVANTAGED AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING SUCH YOUNG PERSONS AS* AFORESAID) IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF PSYCHOSEXUAL HEALTH AMONGST YOUNG PERSONS.
Maes buddion
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.