Dogfen lywodraethu PLYMOUTH CHARITY TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 1076364

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 11 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 DECEMBER 2000 AND 3 MARCH 2010 as amended on 07 Jun 2019 as amended on 19 May 2021 as amended on 14 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH WHO ARE IN NEED; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN CITY OF PLYMOUTH WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CITY OF PLYMOUTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.