Dogfen lywodraethu BOSTON MAYFLOWER LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CARRY ON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE BOROUGH OF BOSTON) A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY C) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT D) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS F) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES G) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES H) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE I) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME J) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Maes buddion
BOROUGH OF BOSTON LINCOLNSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.