Dogfen lywodraethu BLOXHAM SCHOOL LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 JULY 2005, 25 JANUARY 2006, 23 JUNE 2009 AND 28 APRIL 2009. AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 APR 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND EXTEND EDUCATION (INCLUDING SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD OR ELSEWHERE THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1 BY CARRYING ON THE SCHOOL KNOWN AS BLOXHAM SCHOOL AND ANY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS ASSOCIATED WITH IT IN A MANNER WHICH DEVELOPS AND SUSTAINS A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT CENTRED ON THE ANGLICAN TRADITION OF THE EUCHARIST AND AT WHICH A FUNDAMENTAL IMPORTANCE IS ATTACHED TO THE TEACHING OF THOSE PRINCIPLES; 3.2 PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF WOODARD CORPORATION; 3.3 PROMOTING THE USE OF THE FACILITIES OF ANY SCHOOL BY THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
CHURCH OF ENGLAND DIOCESE OF OXFORD AND ELSEWHERE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.