RELATE MID WILTSHIRE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Relate Mid Wiltshire works to encourage respect and fulfilment in all relationships, particularly couple and family relationshps, thus promoting individual well-being throughout mid Wiltshire.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gwlad Yr Haf
- Wiltshire
Llywodraethu
- 28 Ebrill 2000: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Mai 2022: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- RELATE MID WILTSHIRE (Enw gwaith)
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £521.12k | £570.33k | £519.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £487.99k | £526.25k | £526.06k | £105.85k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £17.00k | £110.49k | £35.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £16.00k | £12.00k | £32.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | £487 | £1.37k | £31 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | £1.39k | £1.92k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | £519.03k | £566.85k | £518.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | £217 | £196 | £90 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | £487.33k | £525.65k | £526.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | £660 | £605 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | £11.95k | £0 | £13.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 14 Awst 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 06 Mawrth 2020 | 35 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003, 3 OCTOBER 2008, AND DATED 23 OCTOBER 2009 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 16 DECEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE; 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH; 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR - 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
KENNET, NORTH WILTSHIRE AND WEST WILTSHIRE DISTRICTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window