Dogfen lywodraethu THE HOLST BIRTHPLACE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 1078599

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 NOVEMBER 1999 as amended on 05 Jul 2021 as amended on 03 Jul 2017 as amended on 03 Jul 2018 as amended on 01 Jul 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY:- 1) THE MAINTENANCE PROMOTION AND CONTINUING DEVELOPMENT OF A MUSEUM AND PERIOD HOUSE DEDICATED TO GUSTAV HOLST; AND 2) ENCOURAGING THE ART OF MUSIC
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN CHELTENHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.