MANNA MINISTRIES EUROPE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To advance the Christian faith in Poland and Macedonia and in such other parts of Europe or the world as the Trustees may from time to time think fit and to fulfil such other purposes which are exclusively charitable according to the law of England and Wales and are connected with the charitable work of the Trust. To relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Gwlad Yr Haf
- Swydd Northampton
- Macedonia
Llywodraethu
- 06 Chwefror 2002: Cofrestrwyd
- 07 Chwefror 2024: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £5.35k | £20.45k | £26.98k | £27.94k | £19.91k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £28.00k | £23.15k | £27.17k | £31.81k | £23.44k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2022 | 20 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2021 | 11 Mai 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2021 | 11 Mai 2022 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 17 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | 21 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 08 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUSTS DATED 18 DECEMBER 2001.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN POLAND AND MACEDONIA AND IN OTHER SUCH PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATIONS AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
IN POLAND AND MACEDONIA AND IN OTHER PARTS OF EUROPE OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window