Dogfen lywodraethu THE PLAYHOUSE THEATRE CHELTENHAM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/07/1999 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2017 as amended on 08 Jun 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS OF DRAMA, LITERATURE, DANCE MUSIC AND SINGING THROUGH THE PRODUCTION OF PLAYS AND OTHER ARTISTIC WORKS. TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO RESTORE AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PLAYHOUSE THEATRE IN CHELTENHAM BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORIC ARCHITECTURAL HERITAGE AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Maes buddion
CHELTENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.