Dogfen lywodraethu VALE LANDSCAPE HERITAGE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 3 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED ON 30 APRIL 2004. AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2017 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
IN EVESHAM AND PERSHORE IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS 1) TO CONSERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE NATURAL BEAUTY, WILDLIFE AND HERITAGE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AND 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURAL, HISTORICAL AND PRESENT-DAY ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
IN EVESHAM AND PERSHORE IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.