Dogfen lywodraethu CUTTY SARK TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/1952 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2000 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/03/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (A) RESTORE AND PRESERVE AND ASSIST IN THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE CLIPPER SHIP CUTTY SARK AND TO REPAIR RECONSTRUCT AND MAINTAIN THE SAME AND TO ASSIST IN THE REPAIR RECONSTRUCTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SAME IN PERPETUITY AS A NATIONAL MONUMENT AND A MEMORIAL TO THE MERCHANT NAVY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BY WORKING WITH THE NATIONAL MARITIME MUSEUM; AND (B) SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE NATIONAL MARITIME MUSEUM.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.