Dogfen lywodraethu THE SEVERNSIDE INITIATIVE FOR PSYCHOTHERAPY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/02/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC TREATMENT AND RELATED SERVICES SERVICES TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN NEED THEREOF
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL, SOMERSET, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, HEREFORDSHIRE, DEVON, WILTSHIRE, DORSET, OXFORDSHIRE AND S. WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.