Dogfen lywodraethu SMART WORKS CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2016 as amended on 03 Oct 2019 as amended on 17 Mar 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF ECONOMIC INDEPENDENCE AMONG WOMEN IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY PROVIDING WORK APPROPRIATE CLOTHING FOR INDIVIDUALS SEEKING EMPLOYMENT AND / OR EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES, PROVIDING JOB-SEEKING ADVICE, TRAINING AND EDUCATION AND PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES FOR THOSE WHO SUCCESSFULLY PROCURE EMPLOYMENT OR AN EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITY, AND PROVIDED THAT SUCH BENEFITS MAY BE PROVIDED TO MEN WHERE IT IS DEEMED APPROPRIATE, IN THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, IN THE COURSE OF ADVANCING THE OVERALL OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.