Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF BARBERSHOP SINGERS
Rhif yr elusen: 1080930

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 26 NOV 2020 as amended on 08 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Jul 2022 as amended on 17 Mar 2023 as amended on 01 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ANY AND ALL ASPECTS OF BARBERSHOP HARMONY (AS DEFINED IN THE APPENDIX TO THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES) AND SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP HARMONY STYLE ("THE OBJECTS")
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.