Dogfen lywodraethu CARN BREA LEISURE CENTRE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS FOR RECREATION, SPORT AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO LIVE, WORK, STUDY IN OR VISIT CAMBORNE POOL AND REDRUTH AND THE SURROUNDING GEOGRAPHICAL AREA. TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH THROUGH COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Maes buddion
KERRIER DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.