Dogfen lywodraethu CLINTON'S GIFT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 06 JUN 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 MAY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 DEC 2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH BY REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE CHURCH. 2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSE 1 ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF HIGHWORTH WITH SEVENHAMPTON AND INGLESHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.