Dogfen lywodraethu NATWEST SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Dec 2020 as amended on 29 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE WITH A PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON PROVIDING FLEXIBLE FINANCE AND SUPPORT WITH FUNDING APPLICATIONS. THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, SCOTLAND AND WALES AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AS SHALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Maes buddion
SHROPSHIRE, HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, WARWICKSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF STOKE-ON-TRENT, WOLVERHAMPTON, WASALL, SANDWELL, DUDLEY, BIRMINGHAM, SOLIHULL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.