CHARIS CHRISTIAN CENTRE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
a. Ministering every week to the spiritual needs of the people through bible study,prayer meetings, counselling sessions and healing meetings. b. Core Church events for the year included Women's Retreat, Youth Celebration Service, Be Healed Convention and the International day.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 15 May 2009
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Waltham Forest
Llywodraethu
- 25 Hydref 2011: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1131271 CHARIS CHRISTIAN CENTRE
- 14 Gorffennaf 2000: Cofrestrwyd
- 25 Hydref 2011: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 15/05/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £227.62k | £213.18k | £362.26k | £264.58k | £98.85k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £230.81k | £216.52k | £225.56k | £237.26k | £79.24k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Mai 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Mai 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Mai 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Mai 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 15 Mai 2009 | 31 Hydref 2010 | 230 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 15 Mai 2009 | 28 Hydref 2010 | 227 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 28 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2008 | 28 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1999, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTARY DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JUNE 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING, OPERATING OR SUPPORTING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window