Dogfen lywodraethu HEREFORDSHIRE HEARTSTART
Rhif yr elusen: 1082309
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/08/2007 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 18/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/2014 AS AMENDED ON 15/06/2015 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF LIFE
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE HEREFORDSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.