Dogfen lywodraethu THE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF INCORPORATED 7 MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 JUNE 2000, 15 AUGUST 2000,15 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 18 JULY 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE CARE, EDUCATION AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DYSLEXIA OR ANY OTHER RELATED SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTY (B) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, TEACHERS AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONS ABOUT DYSLEXIA AND OTHER RELATED LEARNING DISABILITIES AND TO EDUCATE AND TRAIN THE PUBLIC, TEACHERS AND OTHER RELATED PROFESSIONS ABOUT THE CARE, EDUCATION AND TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS (C) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO DYSLEXIA AND OTHER RELATED SPECIFIC LEARNING DISABILITIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Maes buddion
ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.