Dogfen lywodraethu LANCASHIRE MIND LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/11/2014 as amended on 01 Apr 2025 as amended on 01 Apr 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Association are, for the public benefit, in particular but not exclusively, in Lancashire: A) To promote the preservation of good mental health, in particular by enabling and empowering everyone experiencing mental health conditions to live with, manage and recover from their condition. B) To relieve the needs of people with mental health conditions by working to increase the understanding of mental health and mental health conditions, by gathering and disseminating information and working to raise awareness, promote understanding and challenge stigma and discrimination.
Maes buddion
THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF LANCASHIRE, INCLUDING BLACKBURN AND BLACKPOOL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.