Dogfen lywodraethu GURDWARA SRI GURU NANAK DEV JI OXFORD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/06/2000 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE OXFORD SRI GURU SINGH SABHA GURDWARA SHALL BE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION IN OXFORDSHIRE. THIS SHOULD BE ACHIEVED AS FOLLOWS: (A) BY HOLDING DAY TO DAY PRAY MEETINGS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE THE SIKH FAITH IN SIKH COMMUNITY. (B) BY ARRANGING LECTURES ON SIKHISM AND CELEBRATING RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND FUNCTIONS. (C) BY DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON SIKHISM (AS FOR AS POSSIBLE IN ENGLISH) TO ENLIGHTEN THE PEOPLE OF OTHER FAITHS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION. (D) BY TEACHING SIKH RELIGIOUS LANGUAGE 'PUNJABI' TO THE SIKH CHILDREN AND WHERE POSSIBLE, CHILDREN OF OTHER FAITHS, ON THE BASIS OF THEIR INTEREST AND ATTAINMENT IN THE FIELD OF SIKH RELIGION AND LITERATURE. (E) BY HELPING OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND SEEKING HELP FROM THEM.
Maes buddion
OXFORDSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.